Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hardt Investments Llc, Dba Tyner Ranch Apartments, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gonzalez, Arturo Torres, Torres, Marlene, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims Trial De Novo |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Trial De Novo
Date: October 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2018 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
December 19, 2017 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Judgment for Respondent after Trial de Novo
Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial De Novo
Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo 10/17/2017 Trial De Novo APPEAL OF THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial De Novo APPEAL OF THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO |
|
September 20, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Appeal from Small Claims/Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.