Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Watson, Lotto, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Colbert, Darlene, Sullivan, Latonya, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims Trial De Novo |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Trial De Novo
Date: October 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Judgment for Respondent after Trial de Novo
Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 30, 2017 | Hearing | Ruling | |
October 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial De Novo
Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo 10/17/2017 Trial De Novo APPEAL OF THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
October 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial De Novo APPEAL OF THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
August 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO |
|
August 02, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Appeal from Small Claims/Trial | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.