Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kidd, Adam L, against Moreno, Candi G, represented by March, Daniel S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Date: September 01, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)
Date: April 21, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 16, 2023 | Hearing |
Jury Trial
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 19, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
January 19, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Plaintiff's CMC Statement |
|
January 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Plaintiff's CMC Statement |
|
December 03, 2021 | Hearing | Ruling | |
October 25, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement Defendant's Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.