Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Releford Steven, Rosas Jose, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against County Of Los Angeles, Olney John Crosby, Pratt Colin, Raquel Pratt Doe 2, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Soussan G. Bruguera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSoussan G. Bruguera Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions123 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 17, 2016VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC
Date: August 04, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: August 15, 2016DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2016Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: August 17, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: August 17, 2016Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: September 08, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: September 21, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: September 21, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.