Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Westlake Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Friedman Joshua P. Esq., against Powers Matthew, Powers Wholesale Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Soussan G. Bruguera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSoussan G. Bruguera Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2016 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions55 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 18, 2016Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: November 18, 2016Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 18, 2016Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 18, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.