Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Malik Ali, Rodriguez Charles, Yousefi Atefeh, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Hatcher Jason T., Myers David Patrick Esq., Kitson Robert M, against Us Bank National Association Dba Us Bank, represented by Fife Joan B Tucker, Woodhead Emilie Consuelo, Kirk Tristan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy D. Hogue Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Document:Minute Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-21T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Order And Joint Stipulation To Lift Stay; Signed and Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Second Amended Class Action Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Plaintitt's Notice Of Remand Order And Status Of Removal To Federal Court; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Notice Of Appearance; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice Of Court Order Re Notice Of Remand And Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Court Order re Notice of Related Case; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Notice Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00General Denial Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Second Amended Class Action Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff); US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Notice of Related Case) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code 2699(1)(2) Submission to the LWDA) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code 2699(I)(2) Submission to the LWDA) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Order RE Stipulation for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Case Reassignment) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fairness Hearing (Final); Hearing on Motion for Final Approva...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code ¿2699(l)(2) Submission to the LWDA) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Stipulation for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation Submitted on )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC617356 with Relat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Answer (to 3rd Amended Complaint) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Court Order re Notice of Related Case; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Second Amended Class Action Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Answer (to 3rd Amended Complaint) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation Submitted on )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff); US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00General Denial Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC617356 with Relat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Notice of Related Case) Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by US Bank National Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code 2699(I)(2) Submission to the LWDA) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Order RE Stipulation for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Case Reassignment) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Stipulation for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fairness Hearing (Final); Hearing on Motion for Final Approva...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code 2699(1)(2) Submission to the LWDA) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code ¿2699(l)(2) Submission to the LWDA) Filed by Charles Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Notice Of Appearance
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice Of Court Order Re Notice Of Remand And Initial Status Conference
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-21T00:00:00Answer (to 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Order (And Joint Stipulation To Lift Stay)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation Submitted on ))
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Second Amended Class Action Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint))
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Joint Stipulation For Leave To Amend Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Order
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Declaration (N. Rosenthanl Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Jason Hatcher in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice (Of Related Case and Continuance Of Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case) of )
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC617356 with Relat...))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC617356 With Related Case No. 19STCV17516)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Rodriquez's Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00U.S. Bank National Association's Notice of Errata re Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (K. Agnew Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation re Extending Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of )
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code 2699(I)(2) Submission to the LWDA)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (L. Lee Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (A. Yousefi Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff Charles Rodriguez in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (C. Rodriguez Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Declaration (A. Malik Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (J. Hatcher Declaration & Exhibits ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Declaration (W. Marder Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Stipulation for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code 2699(1)(2) Submission to the LWDA)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Christina Fowler Regarding Notice and Settlement Administration)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice (of Labor Code ¿2699(l)(2) Submission to the LWDA)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Order RE Stipulation for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fairness Hearing (Final); Hearing on Motion for Final Approva...))
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((4th))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Plaintitt's Notice Of Remand Order And Status Of Removal To Federal Court
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Order (And Joint Stipulation To Lift Stay)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case) of 08/02/2019)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice (Of Related Case and Continuance Of Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC617356 With Related Case No. 19STCV17516)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC617356 with Relat...))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Answer (to 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation re Extending Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation Submitted on 05/13/2020))
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff Charles Rodriguez in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Jason Hatcher in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing Motion for Preliminary A...))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint))
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.