Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kyle Scott Law Plc, Oakes Mitchell Hunter, Liberty Insurance Corporation, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Doucette Jason Reilly, Mclachlan Michael Douglas, Scott Kyle Joseph, against Guzman Salvador, Nicholas Paulos, Progressive Transportation Services Inc., Liberty Insurance Corporation, represented by Maslauski Steven Martin, Paulos Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial1153 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1950 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1917 days |
Document:Complaint in Intervention Filed by: Attorney for Intervenor APIV
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2014-10-21T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Interveor
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order on Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Jury Question - juror questions for witness Dr. Gross; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Appeal Document NOA: B305535 & B306427 ORDER CONSOLIDATING FOR BRIEFING PURPOSES. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Appeal - Court Reporter Waiver of Transcript Deposit Appellant; Filed by:
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B303; Filed by:
Date: February 22, 2022Jury Question - Jurors' Questions for Witness Mark Spoonamore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Jury Question Jury Questions for Expert Witness Enrique Vega, M.S. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Jury Question 9:36 AM Request to hear cross-examination of Mark Gomez and Stein Husher; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials) Stipulation Read to Jury; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Motion for Attorney Fees, Notice of Rejection - Pleadings]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Opinion Received B305535; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Judgment on Jury vVrdict) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid RESPONDENT PAID $339.69; Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Motion re: Directed Verdict; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2014-10-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B306427, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Defense Request for Clarification.) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter RE: David Ocanas CSR# 12567; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $569.19; Filed by:
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Jury Question - Jurors' Questionf for Witness Mark Gomez, Ph. D. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Jury Question 11:32 AM; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B305535, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00FINAL JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by MITCHELL HUNTER OAKES on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Nicholas Paulos (Attorney)
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order ( (Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. and Salvador Guzman...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by MITCHELL HUNTER OAKES on , judgment entered on as to Salvador Guzman is
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulated Issues) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Ex Parte Ruling re Trial Cont.) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's Ex Parte Application To continue trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant); Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant); Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((not entered)) Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant); Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to continue trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Court Should Not Adopt Defense Ve...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Jury Question (- Jurors' Questions for Witness Mark Spoonamore) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Jury Question (- Jurors' Questionf for Witness Mark Gomez, Ph. D.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Motion for Attorney Fees, Notice of Rejection - Pleadings]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Judgment on Jury vVrdict) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Motion re: (Directed Verdict) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Jury Question (9:36 AM Request to hear cross-examination of Mark Gomez and Stein Husher) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Judgment on Jury Verdict)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Jury Question (- juror questions for witness Dr. Gross) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Affidavit (Election To Forgo (CCP Section 170.6)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Jury Question (11:32 AM) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Jury Question (Jury Questions for Expert Witness Enrique Vega, M.S.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials) (Stipulation Read to Jury) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Order (Re: Motions Ruled on ) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Nicholas Paulos (Attorney)
Date: November 01, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U") Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Appellant)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Tax Cos...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Kyle Joseph Scott (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Defense Request for Clarification.) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B305535, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Appellant)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Tax Plaintiff's Costs) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B306427, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA: B305535 & B306427 ORDER CONSOLIDATING FOR BRIEFING PURPOSES.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00FINAL JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defense Request for Clarification.)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Objection and Clarification Request by Defense)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff); Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Affidavit Election To Forgo (CCP Section 170.6); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kyle Joseph Scott (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-10-21T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendants' Ex-Parte application to continue trial date and a...))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial date and all applicable dates;)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to continue trial))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Ex Parte Ruling re Trial Cont.)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendants Progressive Transportation...))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice (of Assignment of Lien)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for order shortening time on a noticed motion to continue trial)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To continue trial))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Move Forward with Original Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Move Forward with Original Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Move Forward with Original Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((not entered))
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. and Salvador Guzman...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's Ex Parte Application To continue trial))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Intent to Use Audio or Video Recording of Deposition)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Notice of Intent)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulated Issues)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Affidavit (Election To Forgo (CCP Section 170.6))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Tarle, Dept. J, Santa Monica Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Vicki A. Saber CSR# 6212)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Jury Question (- juror questions for witness Dr. Gross)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Jury Question (Jury Questions for Expert Witness Enrique Vega, M.S.)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Angela M. Albarez)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To continue trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant); Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendants' Ex-Parte application to continue trial date and a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant); Salvador Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Notice Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendants Progressive Transportation...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application) Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Progressive Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Summons Filed by Mitchell Hunter Oakes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Jury Question (- Jurors' Questions for Witness Mark Spoonamore)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Jury Question (- Jurors' Questionf for Witness Mark Gomez, Ph. D.)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Motion re: (Directed Verdict)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Jury Question (11:32 AM)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials) (Stipulation Read to Jury)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Jury Question (9:36 AM Request to hear cross-examination of Mark Gomez and Stein Husher)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment on Jury Verdict)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Judgment on Jury Verdict))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Judgment on Jury vVrdict) of 01/07/2020)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Judgment (on Jury Verdict Prepared by defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Court Should Not Adopt Defense Ve...))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Index of Exhibits to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to New Trial or in the Alternative, Request for Additur)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (re Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Tax Plaintiff's Costs)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Motion for Attorney Fees, Notice of Rejection - Pleadings])
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Tax Cos...))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/16/2020)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:3/26/20)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging Exhibits Per Rule 8.122(a)(3))
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Respondent's Notice of Designating Record on Appeal
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Lodging Exhibits)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Order (Re: Motions Ruled on 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Request (for Clarification of Court's Ruling and Notice of Objection to Order)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B305535, NOA 03/26/20;)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Objection and Clarification Request by Defense))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Defense Request for Clarification.) of 06/09/2020)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defense Request for Clarification.))
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiff's Latest Objection to Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Objection (to Court's Statement of Decision and Defendants' Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Final Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00FINAL JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00FINAL JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:6/25/20; "U")
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B306427, NOA 6/25/20;)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 3/26/20)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA:03/26/20 B305535 & B306427 ORDER CONSOLIDATING FOR BRIEFING PURPOSES.)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.