Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia-Cortez Israel, Hernandez Alejandro, Martinez Israel, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Cohen H. Jason. Esq., Kaufman Martin J. Esq., Kick Law Firm Apc, Lee & Kaufman Llp, Lomas Raul G., (total of 5) See All against Asphalt Hot Stuff, Design Containers Inc. A Florida Corp., Foreland Refining Corporation, Roofing Wholesale Co. Inc., U.S.A. Home Depot, (total of 5) See All represented by Barnes Craig S.Esq., Crawford David Iii Esq., Harrington Foxx Dubrow & Canter Llp, Mcconnell John W. Iii Esq., Pollard Mavredakis Cranert Crawford &, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David L. Minning presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Minning Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management898 days |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2005 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions288 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1511 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 61 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND, ETC | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT | |
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 61 (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; OSC Discharged) - |
|
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.