We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Dennis Vs Voneckardt

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Dennis , James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Voneckardt , Thomas H, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

May 02, 2016

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Auto Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

725 days

Time To Management

171 days

Time To Trial

464 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Order to Consolidate Cases Filed

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 04/27/2018 time: 10:00 AM
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 03/29/2018 time: 09:00 AM
Docket Event Notice of Settlement Filed for James Dennis
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Hearing Restored: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/29/2018 09:00 AM D- 302
Docket Event Hearing Restored: Civil Jury Trial 04/27/2018 10:00 AM D- 520
Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 01/08/2018 02:30 PM D- 520
Docket Event Compliance Hearing Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 01/08/2018 time: 02:30 PM
See all events