Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robinson-Red, Jazzmine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ardoin, Marshon La'Ron Jr, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Andrew A. Steckler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew A. Steckler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2016 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2016 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Andrew Steckler |
||
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dropped | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 04/05/2016 09:30 AM D- 514 | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 04/05/2016 09:30 AM D- 511 | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous TRO GRANTED IN PART Filed | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Jazzmine Robinson-Red | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.