Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Xxxxx-Xxxxxxxxx, Xxxxxxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Xxxxx-Xxxxxxxxx, Xxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gregory A. Syren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory A. Syren Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Gregory Syren |
||
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
December 14, 2020 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
October 26, 2020 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Visitation Filed | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to RFO - Family Law 12/14/2020 08:30 AM D- 516 | |
July 28, 2020 |
Request for Order re:...
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO Hearing Dropped - No Appearance by Parties | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.