Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clementi, Christopher, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Tunney, Alexis, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Margaret Fujioka presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Fujioka Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2015 |
CategoryRegistration Of Out-Of-State Custody Decree |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
October 05, 2020 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Margaret Fujioka |
||
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 510 date: 11/18/2020 time: 01:00 PM | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Referred to Family Court Services | |
October 05, 2020 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
July 15, 2020 |
Request for Order re: Modification...
Judge: Margaret Fujioka |
||
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 510 date: 10/05/2020 time: 01:00 PM | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.