Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Cary Nishimoto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCary Nishimoto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2013 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2013 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 25, 2013 | Hearing |
in Department E Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
March 07, 2013 | Hearing |
Amended Petition Filed by J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC (Petitioner) |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC (Petitioner) |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC (Petitioner); KYRON SHAKIR (Legacy Party) |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC (Petitioner) |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed by null |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC (Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.