Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Srenco Linda, Srenco Ronald, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Heimberg Steven A., against Campos Victor Doe 2, Conquest Medical Inc. - Doe 4Dismissed, Conquest Medical Inc. - Doe 4, Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive, Joseph J. Wright, (total of 17) See All represented by Baukol Marcus M., Donald Fesler, Doyle & Shafer Llp, Fesler Donald, Fesler Don Esq., (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William A. MacLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. MacLaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1225 days |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2011 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions677 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1650 days |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2012-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: TURRELL NEURODIAGNOS TIC SERVICES )
Date: 2012-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT SUMMONS PARTY SERVED: VICTOR CAMPOS AS DOE 2 )
Date: 2012-10-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; DECL.'S; EXHIBITS )
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Notice (RE: SIGNATURE PAGE FOR FOR DECL LINSA DOBIE R.N. J.D. )
Date: 2012-10-23T00:00:00Notice (RE: FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE FOR DECL OF FRANK COUFAL M.D. )
Date: 2012-10-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA FOR DEF TORRANCE MEMORIA MEDICAL )
Date: 2012-10-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-10-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (RE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE )
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Notice (re>unvailability )
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (LAFOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DEHAAS, FESLE & AMES )
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (RE: HEARING ON 01/03/13 TO 03/12 RE: HEARING ON 03/12/13 TO 04/16 )
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Notice (OF THIRD CONTINUANCE OF DEFT. TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPO )
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Order (shortening time hearing motion to compel depos )
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFTS. V. CAMPOS AND TURRELL'S EX PARTE APPL. TO CONT. TRIAL )
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO COMPEL )
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Statement of Facts (of undisputed facts )
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (documentary evidence )
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Response
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS )
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Reply/Response (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS )
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Order (RULING RE: MSJ OR INT ALT, MSA OF ISSUES & NTC RE FUTURE CAL DATES/TIMES RE FSC & TRIAL )
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (RULING RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS )
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PLNTS. MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOS.; )
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (RE: CONQUEST MEDICAL, INC. - DOE 4 )
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (DOE 3 IS JOSEPH J. WRIGHT )
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S WX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER )
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-06-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFT. VICTOR CAMPOS )
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (FURTHER RESPOSNES FORM DEFT. TURRELL NEURODIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, INC. )
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2013-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 1/9/14 )
Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2013-08-05T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: JOSEPH J. WRIGHT AS DOE 3 )
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY ADJ )
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSA )
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSAI )
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN TO CMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES )
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. 2 )
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. 2 )
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION, SET NO. ONE )
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET #2 )
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO THE EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEF IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF T. EDWARD SHARDLOW )
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF DON FESLER IN SUPPORT OF EX- PARTE TO CONT TRIAL )
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE TO CONT TRIAL )
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Response (TO OPP TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS )
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Objection Document Filed ((EVIDENTIARY) TO OPPOSITION )
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NTC )
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR PLTS' MTN TO COMPE )
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL )
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMETN OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF STACY L. RAPHAEL, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Response (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTE FACTS AND ADDITIONA DISPUTED FACTS IN OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID FRECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORTOF MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Response (TO ADDITIONAL DISUTED )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Reply (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND ADDITONAL DISPUTED FACTS IN OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Response (TO ADDITIONAL DISPUTED FACTS OF DEFS IN OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN REPLY TO OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEF IN SUPPORTOF OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MSA )
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE: MSJ OF DEF, VICTOR CAMPOS )
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE: MSJ OF DEF, TURRELL DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES )
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Response (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO THE EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO THE EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEF IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Opposition (TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Response (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS OF DEF VICTOR CAMPOS )
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (FOR ORDER DISQUALIFYING CHARLES D. YINGLING AS PLTS EXPERT )
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF CHARLES YINGLING, PH.D )
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Application - misc (TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL DECL OF ART GHARIBIAN, ESQ. UNDER SEAL )
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Application
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 RE EXPERT'S PERSON PRACTICES )
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5 SEEKING AN ORDER ALLOWING EVIDENCE OF THE PLT'S COLLATERAL SOURCES )
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO LIMIT MENTION OF INSURANCE DURING VOIR DIRE )
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLTS FROM ARGUING OF THE LIMITED ON NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES )
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-05-01T00:00:00Amended Notice (FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2014-05-01T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2014-05-01T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SUMMARY OF THE MTNS IN LIMINE AND PRETRIAL REQUEST )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Response (TO ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF STEPHEN L. HEWITT IN SUPPORT OF MTNS IN LIMINE #1-12 AND REQEUSTS #1-2 )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 12 TO LIMIT EVIDENCE AND/OR TESTIMONY TO PAST MEDICAL EXPENSES ACTUALLY PAID )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference (DATE: 3-29-12 )
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2011-10-21T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed (ANSWER OF TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER )
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Declaration (BY TRIAL ATTORNEY )
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed (ANSWER CHANG RHEE M.D. )
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (SERVED RANDOPH O'HARA M.D. BY SUB SERVICE ON 11/18/11 SERVED:SUMMONS; COMPLAINT.. )
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2012-02-15T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-03-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (re: terrence j schafer )
Date: 2012-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (-JURY TRIAL -SEE STATEMENT FOR UNAVAILABLE DATES - 7 TO 10 DAYS )
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management (-JURY TRIAL -SEE STATEMENT FOR UNAVAILABLE DATES -15 - 20 DAY EST. )
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Receipt - General
Date: 2012-07-20T00:00:00Receipt - General (CIVIL DEPOSIT-JURY FEES POSTED )
Date: 2012-07-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1/ TURRELL NEURODIAGONOSTIC SERVICES INC DOE/2 VICTOR CAMPOS )
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2012-09-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Notice (RE: POST MEDIATION STATUS CONF )
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Notice (OF FIRM NAME CHANGE FOR DEFT. COUNSEL )
Date: 2012-10-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-10-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE PLT'S USE OF DEF EXPERT WITNESSES DURING THEIR CASE IN CHEIF )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.9 TO PRECLUDE EVIDNECE OR TESTIMONY RE PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT CIVIL LAWSUITS )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM NON-DESIGNAT EXPERT WITNESSES )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN TO DISQUALIFY CHARLES YINGLING, PH.D. AS PLTS' EXPERT )
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SUR-REPLY TO MSJ )
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MTN FOR AN ORDER DISQUALIFYING CHARLES YINGLING, PH.D AS PLTS' EXPERT )
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO SURREPLY RE TURRELL MSJ )
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPP TO MTN FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion (TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION )
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLT'S CARE MAY BE ROVIDED BY HIS WIFE )
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE NO 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REDUCED LIFE EXPECTANC )
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-05-22T00:00:00Application-Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE )
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Memorandum - Fees (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN W. PATTON, JR. )
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL G. VRANICAR IN SUP0PORT OF ADMISSION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN W. PATTON, JR. )
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Application-Pro Hac Vice (FOR ADMISSION OF PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN W. PATTON )
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL G. VRANICAR IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF HOHN A. OUSKA )
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Memorandum - Other (IN SUPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF HOHN A. OUSKA )
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Memorandum - Fees
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO FOURTH EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONT TRIAL )
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Order (ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION SIGNED AND FILED. )
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2014-06-02T00:00:00Brief (OF TRIAL NO. 1 )
Date: 2014-06-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-06-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees deposit )
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Posting Jury Fees )
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Request
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Default Entered (AGAINST: JOSEPH J. WRIGHT )
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE )
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION SET ONE )
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGS )
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS SET NO 2 )
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Reply (TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTEROGS SET NO. 2 )
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES $150.00 )
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-09-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE RE MTNT O COMPEL )
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion (TO COMPEL DEF TO PRODUCE DOCS )
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed (BY DEFT CONQUEST MEDICAL, INC. DOE 4 )
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2013-09-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-09-30T00:00:00Order (RE SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT OF JOSEPH J. WRIGHT (DOE 3) )
Date: 2013-09-30T00:00:00Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF MSJ )
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPP TO MSJ )
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Summary Judgment (AS TO DEFENDANT CHANG RHEE, M.D. SIGNED AND FILED. )
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Order Granting Summary Judgment (AS TO CHANG RHEE, M.D. SIGNED AND FILED )
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Order Granting Summary Judgment
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Summary Judgment
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL AND FINAN STATUS CONF )
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE )
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSA )
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEF CONSQUEST MEDICAL, INC . )
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSA )
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion (TO COMPEL DEF TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION )
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMTN OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE RE MTN TO COMPEL )
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY JUJDGMENT )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF NTC OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF T. EDWARD SHARDLOW, ESQ IN SUPPORTO MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit (A2 IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit (B THROUGH K IN SUPPORTO F MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID FRECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit (A1 IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF T. EDWARD SHARDLOW, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES $150.00 )
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Joinder (DEFDT CAMPOS' JOINDER IN DEFDTS OPPOSITION TO PLTFFS AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-12-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Application
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (BY TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER )
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Rq for Determ of Good Faith Setlmt
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Order (ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER )
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2015-01-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-03-18T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2015-07-07T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER GRANTING DEFS MTN FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT PLTS' EXPERT WITNESS )
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION )
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Order (ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT VICTOR CAMPOS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED. )
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES )
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2014-05-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: April 08, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.