Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Household Finance Corporation Of California, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Stephens, Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 18, 2007 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions46 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time134 days |
Initial Collection Case Review 11/13/2007 02:00 PM D- 707
Date: September 18, 2007Judgment Entered
Date: October 30, 2007Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: June 18, 2007Proof of Service on Complaint As to Leroy Stephens Filed
Date: August 03, 2007Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Leroy Stephens Filed
Date: August 03, 2007Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: June 18, 2007Statement Filed
Date: 2007-06-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.