Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Gainer VS Beasley

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months, 3 weeks

Case Overview

On February 4, 2005 A Civil case was filed by Gainer, Barbara, against Beasley, Carl, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

February 4, 2005

Last Refreshed

Nov 10, 2020

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Unlawful Detainer

Practice Area

Property

Matter Type

Unlawful Detainer

Case Cycle Time

263 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Plaintiff

Defendant

See all parties

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
FTC w/ Local Rules - Complaint

judge: Winton McKibben

Docket Event Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed
FTC w/ Local Rules - Complaint

judge: Winton McKibben

Docket Event Hearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 136 date: 10/25/2005 time: 09:00 AM
Docket Event Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued
FTC w/ Local Rules - Complaint

judge: Winton McKibben

Docket Event Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued
Docket Event Hearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 136 date: 10/11/2005 time: 09:00 AM
Docket Event Civil OSC - Complaints 09/06/2005 09:00 AM D- 136
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.