Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Housing Authority Of The City Of Oakland, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Pegross, Alicia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2003 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Summons with Proof of Service As to Alicia Pegross Filed
Date: June 12, 2003Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Housing Authority of the City of Oakland
Date: May 23, 2003Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: July 09, 2003Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: May 27, 2003Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2003-05-23T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: June 12, 2003For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.