Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tran Tina, Tran Evelyn, Tran Daniel Kien, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2012 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail - Certificate of Mailing | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator General/Limited Cons'r Review Report | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof - Mailing (Filed by: Clerk ) | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof - Mailing (Filed by: Clerk ) | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Filed By: TRAN, DANIEL KIEN, Petitioner in Pro Per ) | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed By: TRAN, DANIEL KIEN, Petitioner in Pro Per ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.