Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ontiveros, Stacy, Ontiveros, John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Scarini, Heath, Mason, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Alice Vilardi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice Vilardi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time346 days |
Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Joseph Mason Filed
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: October 15, 2008Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by John Ontiveros, Stacy Ontiveros
Date: 2008-02-27T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Heath Scarini Filed
Date: 2008-04-23T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Joseph Mason Rejected
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Joseph Mason Filed
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Heath Scarini
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2007-12-19T00:00:00Application Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for Stacy Ontiveros, John Ontiveros
Date: October 15, 2008Letter dated 1/30/2008 to Mr. Phillip G. Vermont Filed
Date: 2008-01-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2008-03-11T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Joseph Mason Filed
Date: 2008-05-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Ontiveros
Date: 2007-12-11T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Proof of Service (Amended) on Complaint
Date: 2008-04-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00Default Court Judgment Entered
Date: November 14, 2008Motion to Amend Complaint Granted
Date: 2008-03-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Heath Scarini
Date: 2007-12-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2007-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2008-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2007-12-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 12/04/2008 08:30 AM D- 512
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed (Amended)
Date: 2007-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: November 19, 2008Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2008-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.