Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cabrera, Joel, Cabrera, Lori, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Granger, Clarence, Magalei, Jeanette, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2007 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions194 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time209 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2007-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2007-07-06T00:00:00Declaration William H. Coke in Response to Order to Show Cause Filed
Date: January 28, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 20, 2007Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 30, 2008Initial Case Management Conference 11/20/2007 08:45 AM D- 19
Date: 2007-07-06T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2007-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-11-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joel Cabrera
Date: 2007-07-05T00:00:00Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered
Date: January 29, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.