Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The County Of San Bernardino, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Beverly J Hill, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with David R. Proulx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid R. Proulx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryGov'T Complt To Establish Ch Supp./Health Ins. |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
June 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: CS;HLTH CARE;JDGMNT(051002) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO - Minutes Off Calendar DAVID R PROULX PRESIDING CLERK: VICKY GAITAN NOT REPORTED PETITIONER CHARLES HILL PRESENT RESPONDENT BEVERLY J HILL PRESENT ATTORNEY MARY LANGIVAN PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. - HEARINGS: OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: STIP SIGNED ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: DAVID R PROULX PRESIDING |
|
June 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED JUDGMENT ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. Not Applicable |
|
May 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: CS;HLTH CARE;JDGMNT(051002) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. Not Applicable |
|
May 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE BEFORE COURT AND TO BRING DOCUMENTS FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. Not Applicable |
|
April 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S OFFICE REJECTED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: DOCUMENT INCOMPLETE *. Not Applicable |
|
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLICATION TO WAIVE FEES FILED BY BEVERLY J HILL | |
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED BY BEVERLY J HILL WITH FEE WAIVER, BY ATTORNEY PRO/PER. Not Applicable |
|
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BEVERLY J HILL Not Applicable |
|
February 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S OFFICE REJECTED ANSWER FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: NDS FEES/POS NOT COMPLETE/DOC IN BLUE INK ETC** **. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.