Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alvarado Gladys N., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diaz Manuel J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 08, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions463 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time468 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Modifying Custody and/or Visitation - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Gladys - Signed on 2015-07-24 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Modifying Custody and/or Visitation - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Gladys - Signed on 2015-07-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Signed on 2011-07-20 ) | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Signed on 2011-07-20 ) | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Gladys ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Gladys ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Gladys - Filed and Entered on 2011-07-15 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Diaz, Manuel - Filed and Entered on 2011-07-15 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.