Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sabreena Apodaca, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Joseph Ahan Foroosh M.D., represented by Kavanaugh, Carol T, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with John M. Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M. Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2001 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions459 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time459 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: POST ARBITRATION COMPLETION VACATED |
|
April 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: POST ARBITRATION COMPLETION - Minutes Continued CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/02/03 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. Judge: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/02/03 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. |
|
April 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: POST ARBITRATION COMPLETION - Minutes Continued CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/05/03 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. Judge: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/05/03 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. |
|
March 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
March 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
March 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
March 20, 2003 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CON POST ARBIT HRG FILED. Not Applicable |
|
March 20, 2003 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V9 | |
October 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SELECTION OF ARBITRATOR VACATED |
|
October 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR JOHN A HENLEY FILED BY JOSEPH AHAN FOROOSHM.D.. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.