Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Ramos Stephanie, Sanchez Jonathan, Ross Joshua, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Dawkins Krista, Leverone Jackson Thomas, Pyka Lenhardt Schnaider Dawkins, against Nodbeh Enterprises Inc., Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. Dba Servpro Dba Servpro, Raav Corporation Dba Servpro Of Whittier Dba Servpro Of Whittier, Raav Corporation Doing Business As Servpro Of Whittier, Ramos Jose, (total of 9) See All represented by Ajalat Gregory Michael, Mcnamara Kevin Patrick, Llp Tyson & Mendes, Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsberry Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Verdict Form- Defendant Jonathan Sanchez Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: February 16, 2023Verdict Form- Defendant Raav Corporation Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: February 16, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Krista Elizabeth Dawkins (Attorney)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: STEPHANIE RAMOS (Defendant); JOSE RAMOS (Defendant); JONATHAN SANCHEZ (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Answer to cross complaint; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Krista Elizabeth Dawkins (Attorney)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Matthew Wilson (Defendant); Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Errata Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Matthew Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 1-12-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order - Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Filed By: Stephanie Ramos (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Stephanie Ramos (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 3-15-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (hearing date ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Verdict Form- Unified Damages Form; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Matthew Wilson; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Stephanie Ramos; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. (Defendant); Matthew Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Jonathan Sanchez; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Stephanie Ramos (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Jose Ramos; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Raav Corporation; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Jury Request or Question #3; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 12-13-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Stipulation re: Bifurcation of Punitive/Exemplary Damages (MIL 2); Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Jury Request or Question #2 and Response; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Advancing Order to Show Cause Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Directed Verdict; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 26, 2023Jury Request or Question; Filed by: Clerk; Charge Fee ?: YES
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Trial Setting Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Order / Ruling (Hearing held 9-10-20); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: RAAV CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order Re: hearing on ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. dba Servpro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Reply to Nodbeh's Response to Separate Statement of Disputed Matters; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 6-29-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Separate Statement of Disputed Matters; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Given Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Reply - in Support of Bifurcation Motion; Filed by: Stephanie Ramos (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO MATTHEW WILSON )
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Answer (AS TO NODBEH ENTERPRISES, INC, DBA SERVPRO AND MATTHEW WILSON )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO STEPHANIE RAMOS ON -08-22-18 )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO JONATHAN SANCHEZ ON 08-22-18 )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JOSE RAMOS )
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO NODBEH ENTERPRISES, INC, DBA SERVPRO )
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Answer (to cross complaint)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause re Service of Doe Amendment and Continuance of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint for Damages
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order (Re: hearing on )
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to file Second A...))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing held 9-10-20))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Order)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Disputed Matters)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT...) of )
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATES;))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Disputed Facts And Request For Sanctions)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 6-29-21)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Person Most Knowled...))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Response (to Motion re Matthew Wilson Deposition)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Reply (to Nodbeh's Response to Separate Statement of Disputed Matters)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Matthew Wilson and Nodbeh Enterprises, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application in Joinder to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing the mandatory settlement to 1:30 p.m. ...))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Bifurcate Punitive and Exemplary Damages; Declaration of Jackson Leverone)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (- Stipulated protective order)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex parte application to continue trial and related discovery dates)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application To Contin...))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Brief in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin McNamara In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Order (- Ruling)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application To Contin...))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Advance MSJ Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion FOR ORDER PERMITTING FINANCIAL DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE ¿3295)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Permitting Plaintiff to conduct p...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 1-12-22)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of Gregory Ajalat in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD MARCH 15, 2022) of )
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Response to Plaintiff's Additional Material Facts and Supporting Evidence
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 3-15-22)
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD MARCH 15, 2022))
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Final Status Conference, Trial, and Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (of Joinder and Joinder)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Objection (of PMK of Nodbeh to Notice to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Objection (of Matthew Wilson to Notice to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Objection (of Nodbeh to Notice to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (hearing date )
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Jonathan Sanchez
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Jury Request or Question
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Directed Verdict)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Jury Request or Question #2 and Response
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Stephanie Ramos
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Matthew Wilson
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Jury Request or Question #3
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Verdict Form- Unified Damages Form
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline))
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Verdict Form- Cross- Defendant Joshua Ross
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Advancing Order to Show Cause Hearing))
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Raav Corporation
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline) of )
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Advancing Order to Show Cause Hearing) of )
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Jose Ramos
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Nodbeh Enterprises, Inc.
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to Extend Deadline to Object to the Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Answer To Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend second amended complaint))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Correct Defendant's Nams)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Answer To Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication (ON PLAINTIFF?S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Response (to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Gregory Ajalat in Support of Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Nodbeh Enterprises, Inc. and Matthew Wilson's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Reply (Reply In Support of Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 12-13-22))
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Final Status Conference)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 12-13-22)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Brief (in Support of Motion to Bifurcate Part 2)
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments (- Joinder Motion electronically filed )
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Brief (in Support of Motion to Bifurcate Part 2)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Brief (in Support of Motion to Bifurcate Part 1)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (- Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts)
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Joint)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine #3)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Jury Trial (time estimate for...))
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 of Nodbeh Enterprises, Inc. and Matthew Wilson)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 of Nodbeh to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Emotional Distress)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate))
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motions in Limine))
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation re: Bifurcation of Punitive/Exemplary Damages (MIL 2)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. dba Servpro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments (- Joinder Motion electronically filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Joint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Final Status Conference) Filed by Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing the mandatory settlement to 1:30 p.m. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jose Ramos (Defendant); Stephanie Ramos (Defendant); Jonathan Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jackson Thomas Leverone (Attorney)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing held 9-10-20)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Reply (to Nodbeh's Response to Separate Statement of Disputed Matters) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Answer (to cross complaint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Order (Re: hearing on ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Complaint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO MATTHEW WILSON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Order (- Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD MARCH 15, 2022)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 6-29-21) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jackson Thomas Leverone (Attorney)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 1-12-22) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by RAAV Corporation, dba Servpro of Whittier (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Stephanie Ramos (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Correct Defendant's Nams) Filed by Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motions in Limine)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Stephanie Ramos Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Jury Request or Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Jury Request or Question #2 and Response Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Jose Ramos Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Nodbeh Enterprises Inc. (Defendant); Matthew Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Directed Verdict) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Answer (AS TO NODBEH ENTERPRISES, INC, DBA SERVPRO AND MATTHEW WILSON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Stephanie Ramos (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Matthew Wilson Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Jury Trial (time estimate for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Ex Parte Application) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATES;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Matthew Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint for Damages Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 12-13-22) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Permitting Plaintiff to conduct p...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Disputed Matters) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application To Contin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend second amended complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Stipulation re: Bifurcation of Punitive/Exemplary Damages (MIL 2) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Jury Request or Question #3 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Verdict Form- Unified Damages Form Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Verdict Form- Defendant Nodbeh Enterprises, Inc. Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JOSE RAMOS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to file Second A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Stephanie Ramos (Cross-Complainant); Jonathan Sanchez (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jose Ramos (Defendant); Stephanie Ramos (Defendant); Jonathan Sanchez (Defendant) et al.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Trial Setting Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order Filed by Stephanie Ramos (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 3-15-22) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (hearing date ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Person Most Knowled...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application To Contin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO MATTHEW WILSON )
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JOSE RAMOS )
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO STEPHANIE RAMOS ON -08-22-18 )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO JONATHAN SANCHEZ ON 08-22-18 )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO NODBEH ENTERPRISES, INC, DBA SERVPRO )
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Answer (AS TO NODBEH ENTERPRISES, INC, DBA SERVPRO AND MATTHEW WILSON )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Answer (to cross complaint)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause re Service of Doe Amendment and Continuance of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Order (Re: hearing on 12/19/19)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to file Second A...))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing held 9-10-20))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/27/2020)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATES;))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Order)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Disputed Matters)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Disputed Facts And Request For Sanctions)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Person Most Knowled...))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 6-29-21)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Reply (to Nodbeh's Response to Separate Statement of Disputed Matters)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Response (to Motion re Matthew Wilson Deposition)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/29/2021)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin McNamara In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing the mandatory settlement to 1:30 p.m. ...))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (- Stipulated protective order)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Matthew Wilson and Nodbeh Enterprises, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Bifurcate Punitive and Exemplary Damages; Declaration of Jackson Leverone)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application in Joinder to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex parte application to continue trial and related discovery dates)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application To Contin...))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Order (- Ruling)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Advance MSJ Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application To Contin...))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion FOR ORDER PERMITTING FINANCIAL DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE ¿3295)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Brief in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.