Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ruvalcaba Placido, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Gomez Villegas Ernesto, Rodriguez Maria, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Robert J. Higa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J. Higa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management178 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions222 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time235 days |
Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: August 14, 2018Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal W/out Prejudice Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: August 14, 2018Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: August 14, 2018Document:Default Entered Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: August 14, 2018Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Summons Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by PLACIDO RUVALCABA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.