Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Macias Joel, Macias Renata, Rodriguez Renata Aka Renata Macias, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Gaugh Kenneth Ray Esq., against Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, Majestic Group Llc, Medina Maria Elieta Orozco, Roberto Vargas Trustee Of The Roberto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Patrick T. Meyers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Meyers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management166 days |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2017 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time432 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Appl, Waiver of Court Fees & Costs Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Personal Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Order, Forma Pauperis Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing/Trial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Renata Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Joel Macias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Renata Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Renata Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Joel Macias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Renata Macias (Plaintiff); Renata Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Renata Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Joel Macias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Renata Macias (Plaintiff); Joel Macias (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00General Denial Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: December 04, 2018Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Notice (of Opportunity to Attend Default Prove-Up Hearing for Quiet Title Claim and Present Evidence)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.