Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Investorforeclosure Corporation, Sandoval Abraham, Martinez David Gomez, Valdivia Araceli, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Abellada Jackielyn Holly Esq., against Anarumo Frank, Anarumo Inspections, Keller Williams Marina Del Rey Doe 2, Soares David Doe 1, Stremiz Esteban D., (total of 6) See All represented by Fowler Law Group, Mojarro Jacob Isaac Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Patrick T. Meyers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Meyers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions304 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time762 days |
Document:Partial Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Document:Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice to Appear Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Motion for New Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Verdict Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service by Moving Party Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Question Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order ORDER-RULING; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Joinder
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Document:Application-Misc. Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Document:Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00General Verdict
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Enter Different Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Vacate Judgment and Enter Different Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Declaration of Jacob I. Mojarro)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((1. Defendant's Motion For Judgment Not Withstanding the Verdi...))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter Re Defendant Esteban D. Stremitz M...))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/26/2018)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.