Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blakely Laura, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ginsburg Evan L. Law Offices Of, against Purdom M.D. Kenneth R., represented by Carroll Kelly Trotter Franzen & Mckenna, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Robert J. Higa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J. Higa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2015 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time447 days |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Brief
Date: January 09, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: January 09, 2017Witness List
Date: January 09, 2017Answer
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: January 09, 2017Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: January 10, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 12, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.