Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tarver Tanya Llanes, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Zone Funding, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Robert J. Higa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J. Higa Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2015 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per APPP
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Document:Statement of Damages Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per APPP
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Document:Order of Dismissal Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: January 04, 2016Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per APPP
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: ClerkCLK
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Order, Forma Pauperis Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Request for Forma Pauperis Order Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Request for Forma Pauperis Order
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: January 04, 2016Order
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.