Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Romero Mario, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Marti Maria Virginia, Cortes Donato, Armex Design And Construction Inc., Armex Construction Inc. A California, Armex Lumber & Building Materials, (total of 5) See All represented by Tabone Derek L. Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Patrick T. Meyers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Meyers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2014 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions351 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time554 days |
Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-04-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-05-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Referee
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Court
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Document:Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2014-12-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Motion to Tax Costs Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Document:Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Document:First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Cross Complnt
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Document:Order of Dismissal Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Document:Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Document:Special Verdict Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Document:Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Document:Ntc Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Document:Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Document:Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Document:Motion for Reconsideration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Other - APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Document:Supplement Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Amended Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: May 14, 2018Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-01-14T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Court
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Opposition Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Opposition Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Reply To Motion Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Summons Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-05-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Exhibit List Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-03-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Opposition Filed by MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by NELLY HOFFMAN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Court
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Motion Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Opposition Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Document:Amended Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party); DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Referee
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-06-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Court
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Reply To Motion Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: May 14, 2018Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff
Date: August 24, 2018Opposition Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Other - (APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Supplement Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Brief-Supplemental Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-12-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Reply To Motion Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Request Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by DONATO CORTES (Legacy Party); MARIA VIRGINIA MARTI (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Brief-Supplemental Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: August 24, 2018First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2014-12-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-12-30 00:00:00
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-15 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-22 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-29 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-10 00:00:00
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-07 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-28 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-05-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-18 00:00:00
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-11 00:00:00
Date: 2015-06-11T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-12 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-02 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by MARIO ROMERO (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Application for Judgment Debtor
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-01-14T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Supplement
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Brief-Supplemental
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 14, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: August 24, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.