Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Freed Kenneth J. Law Offices Of, against Omega Moulding West Llc, represented by Lovett Steven R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Yvonne T. Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvonne T. Sanchez Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2013 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: October 08, 2013Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: July 08, 2013Answer
Date: August 30, 2013Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: August 02, 2013Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 08, 2013Request for Dismissal
Date: October 22, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.