Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Total Drywall Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goodman Sheldon S. A.P.C., against The Richardson Group A California, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Yvonne T. Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvonne T. Sanchez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJune 19, 2013 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 19, 2013Ntc of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens
Date: August 26, 2013Notice
Date: July 01, 2013Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: June 19, 2013Summons
Date: July 01, 2013Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: July 23, 2013Request for Dismissal
Date: August 26, 2013Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: August 02, 2013Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S
Date: September 05, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.