Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos Ryan E., against Selva Jairo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Yvonne T. Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvonne T. Sanchez Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2013 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Clerk |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 04, 2013Summons
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-06-12T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Appl for Writ/Abstract
Date: October 04, 2013Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2013-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: August 27, 2013Request for Dismissal
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 07, 2014Writ filed
Date: July 24, 2017Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 06, 2015Writ issued
Date: March 07, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.