Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin Revenue & Recovery, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Spencer, Tyrone T, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Tracy Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Filing Court HouseTracy Branch |
Case Cycle Time3650 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by County of San Joaquin Revenue & Recovery on 12/17/2009.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Abstract issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Post Judgment effective 11/04/2009
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
November 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 95 days met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
November 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Trial Set met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
November 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 75 days met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status of County of San Joaquin Revenue & Recovery updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status of Tyrone Spencer updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.