Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Uvalles, Raul C Sr, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Mejorado, Rita, Mejorado, Corey, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Tracy Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryLimited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions26 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseTracy Branch |
Case Cycle Time3446 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status of Raul Uvalles updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint associated on 07/26/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Court filed by Uvalles, Raul C Sr on 07/23/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status of Rita Mejorado updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status of Corey Mejorado updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Uvalles, Raul C Sr, against Mejorado, Corey ;Mejorado, Rita in the amount of 1705.00 total damages including 355.00 prejudgment costs, 0.00 attorney fees and 0.00 prejudgment interest.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Court/Clerk Judgment filed by Uvalles, Raul C Sr on 01/19/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint associated on 07/23/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.