Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Flores, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Tracy Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2009 |
CategoryLimited Civil Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseTracy Branch |
Case Cycle Time3754 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management,Other
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter regarding discharge of debtor placed in file.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
November 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
November 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status of Michael Flores updated to Dismissed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. on 04/01/2009.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Automatic Failure to File Default Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.