Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Padilla, Estela P, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Tracy Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions440 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseTracy Branch |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bank of America on 05/28/2009.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status of Bank of America updated to Dismissed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint associated on 06/18/2009.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status of Estela Padilla updated to Dismissed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Bank of America on 06/11/2008.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.