Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Livingston Financial Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Ochoa, Irma L, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Tracy Branch with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2009 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions447 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseTracy Branch |
Case Cycle Time3454 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ has been updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned filed by Livingston Financial LLc on 04/03/2015.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 10/07/2014, transaction number 1409331 and receipt number 372946.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 16517.71.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Postjudgment interest accrued 4097.00.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Livingston Financial LLc on 09/11/2014.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 03/16/2012, transaction number 955835 and receipt number 254982.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Postjudgment costs acknowledged 161.00.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.