Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Alexa Evelyn Celio, Celio, Alexa Evelyn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Van Egmond, Colleen |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation: Unsigned, Accident, or CHP Fixit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.