Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Zachery Samuel Quinn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral in Court | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CT/TBD Flag Cleared | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Advisement of Rights, Plea and Request for Court Trial | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Over The Counter Minute Order
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Waived | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.