Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Yakelen Odilia Rodriguezgomez, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Financial Due Date | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Ringer, Kimberly |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.