Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Angela Yamileth Garcia Arias, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Financial Due Date | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Further Proceedings Set | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | 1st Appear by Date Extension | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.