Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Chana Damien Trahan, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Tourtlotte, Sabrina M |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FTA Appear By Date Extension | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.