Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Martini, Damian Kyle, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynne R. Meredith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to MSB | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.