Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dixon, John Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School - 1st 30-day Extension by Clerk | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral in Court | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | 1st Appear by Date Extension | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.