Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bates, Madison Faith, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic: Juvenile Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Reopen- Case Status Only | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral in Court | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.