Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sonya Dolores Giron, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CAT Fees Addressed | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to MSB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.