Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Steven Mason Pineda, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Anaya, Robert |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | 1st Appear by Date Extension | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.