Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Flanagan, Kyle Ray, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Financial Due Date | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed Proof of Correction Filed | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.