Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Equable Ascent Financial, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Lawoffices Inc, against Michael R Guerena, Renee Guerena, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2010 |
CategoryCollection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT) | ||
January 22, 2021 |
DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT) Continued Not Heard |
||
January 22, 2020 | Hearing | DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT) | |
January 22, 2020 | Hearing |
DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT) Continued Not Heard |
|
April 24, 2017 |
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO ORANGE COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED W/$6190.06 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
June 20, 2016 |
DATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (JUDGMENT) SET ON 1/22/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11 Not Applicable |
||
June 20, 2016 |
DATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (JUDGMENT) SET ON 1/22/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. TEDST - RESCHEDULED TO: Not Applicable |
||
June 20, 2016 | NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER) | ||
June 20, 2016 | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY | ||
June 13, 2016 |
MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.